THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:32:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1900-700 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sermer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sermer (CPSO#: 51616 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19211
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8411
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 3180 & 3269
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 586-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1900-700 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sermer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sermer (CPSO#: 51616 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 19211
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8411
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 3180 & 3269
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 586-4800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHEW SERMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATHEW SERMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980