THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2489 Bloor Street West
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M6S 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 767-3171
Fax: (416) 766-6896

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rick Fox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fox (CPSO#: 51640 )
Business Address: Suite 301
2489 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1R6
(416) 767-3171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2489 Bloor Street West
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M6S 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 767-3171
Fax: (416) 766-6896

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rick Fox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fox (CPSO#: 51640 )
Business Address: Suite 301
2489 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1R6
(416) 767-3171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICKY FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICKY FOX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOX is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982