THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:50:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3560 Bathurst Street
Baycrest hospital
Psychiatry
4e44b
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167852500
Extension: 2453
Fax: 4167852450
Address: Baycrest Hospital
4E44b
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 2453
Fax: 416 7852450
Address: 1466 Bathurst Street
suite 301A
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: 4169170370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Mahony (CPSO#: 51652 )
Business Address: Suite 301A
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
(416) 785-2500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3560 Bathurst Street
Baycrest hospital
Psychiatry
4e44b
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167852500
Extension: 2453
Fax: 4167852450
Address: Baycrest Hospital
4E44b
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 2453
Fax: 416 7852450
Address: 1466 Bathurst Street
suite 301A
Toronto Ontario M5R 3J3
Phone: 4169170370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. O'Mahony Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. O'Mahony (CPSO#: 51652 )
Business Address: Suite 301A
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
(416) 785-2500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL O'MAHONY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MAHONY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL O'MAHONY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'MAHONY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1978