THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:30:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave. E.
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Young Street
Suite 401
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: 905-387-3561
Fax: 905-387-0398
Address: 1 Young St
Suite 419
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Phone: 9053873561
Fax: 9053870398

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. A. Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson (CPSO#: 51657 )
Business Address: 1 Young St
Medical Arts Building
Suite 419
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
9053873561
Business Address: 401 - 1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 387-3561
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-4941
Business Address: 1 Young St
419
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 50 Charlton Ave. E.
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Young Street
Suite 401
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
Phone: 905-387-3561
Fax: 905-387-0398
Address: 1 Young St
Suite 419
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Phone: 9053873561
Fax: 9053870398

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 07 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. A. Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson (CPSO#: 51657 )
Business Address: 1 Young St
Medical Arts Building
Suite 419
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
9053873561
Business Address: 401 - 1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 387-3561
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-4941
Business Address: 1 Young St
419
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ALICE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ALICE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982