THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:08:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Eye Clinic
680 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 745-7844
Fax: (613) 745-5957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Poleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Poleski (CPSO#: 51708 )
Business Address: Ottawa Eye Clinic
680 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T3
(613) 745-7844

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Eye Clinic
680 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 745-7844
Fax: (613) 745-5957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 23 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Poleski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Poleski (CPSO#: 51708 )
Business Address: Ottawa Eye Clinic
680 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T3
(613) 745-7844

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ALLAN POLESKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLESKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ALLAN POLESKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLESKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981