THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:54:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 82 Equinox Crescent
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3B 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-669-7669
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Queen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Queen (CPSO#: 51719 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
Laboratory Office
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 675-4779

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 82 Equinox Crescent
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3B 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-669-7669
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 28 May 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Queen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Queen (CPSO#: 51719 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
Laboratory Office
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 675-4779

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN QUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUEEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN QUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUEEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981