THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:59:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 305-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-4915
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Colette Pyselman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pyselman (CPSO#: 51723 )
Business Address: 305 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-7130

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 305-377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-4915
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 02 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Colette Pyselman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pyselman (CPSO#: 51723 )
Business Address: 305 - 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-7130

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLETTE RINSKE PYSELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYSELMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLETTE RINSKE PYSELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYSELMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982