THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-8660
Fax: (519) 741-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Rinne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rinne (CPSO#: 51733 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 741-8660
Fax: (519) 741-5772

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Rinne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rinne (CPSO#: 51733 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUS HERMAN RINNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUS HERMAN RINNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RINNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981