THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:06:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kashmir University, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 113-820 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 933 8990
Fax: 613 933 8997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Dec 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehar S. Reen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reen (CPSO#: 51756 )
Business Address: McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 110
820 McConnel Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 933-8990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Kashmir University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 113-820 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 933 8990
Fax: 613 933 8997

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 03 Dec 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehar S. Reen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reen (CPSO#: 51756 )
Business Address: McConnell Medical Centre
Suite 110
820 McConnel Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 933-8990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHAR SINGH REEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHAR SINGH REEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kashmir University, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1996

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1979