THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:14:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 504
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 997-6144
Fax: (905) 997-6143

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vladimir Sluzar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sluzar (CPSO#: 51784 )
Business Address: Suite 504
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 997-6144

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 504
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 997-6144
Fax: (905) 997-6143

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vladimir Sluzar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sluzar (CPSO#: 51784 )
Business Address: Suite 504
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 997-6144

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VLADIMIR STEPHEN SLUZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLUZAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VLADIMIR STEPHEN SLUZAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLUZAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982