THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-6160 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 252 4209
Fax: 519 252 0262

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Snowdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Snowdon (CPSO#: 51797 )
Business Address: 6160 Tecumseh Road East
Ste. 203A
Windsor Ontario N8T 1E6
519 252 4209
Business Address: 126 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 252-4209

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-6160 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 252 4209
Fax: 519 252 0262

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 22 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Snowdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Snowdon (CPSO#: 51797 )
Business Address: 6160 Tecumseh Road East
Ste. 203A
Windsor Ontario N8T 1E6
519 252 4209
Business Address: 126 - 2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 252-4209

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE ALLEN SNOWDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNOWDON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRUCE ALLEN SNOWDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNOWDON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981