THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:43:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAMAICAN CREOLE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre,HDH
KidsInclusive, Centre for
Child & Youth Development
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3135
Fax: (613) 545-3557

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Quinte Health Belleville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site
LOCATION: Moosonee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Garth Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Smith (CPSO#: 51800 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre,HDH
KidsInclusive, Centre for
Child & Youth Development
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
613 544 3400 Extn: 3135

Corporation Name: R. Garth Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAMAICAN CREOLE
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre,HDH
KidsInclusive, Centre for
Child & Youth Development
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-3400
Extension: 3135
Fax: (613) 545-3557

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
Quinte Health Belleville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site
LOCATION: Moosonee

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Garth Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Smith (CPSO#: 51800 )
Business Address: 166 Brock Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre,HDH
KidsInclusive, Centre for
Child & Youth Development
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
613 544 3400 Extn: 3135

Corporation Name: R. Garth Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD GARTH SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RONALD GARTH SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982