THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 121 Wellington Street West
Suite 201
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 734-3888
Fax: 705-726-0806
Address: Diabetes Management Centre
490 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Phone: 705-734-9690
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ZATELNY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zatelny (CPSO#: 51881 )
Business Address: 121 Wellington St W
201
Barrie ON L4N 1L2
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Address: 490 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON L4N 6M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 121 Wellington Street West
Suite 201
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 734-3888
Fax: 705-726-0806
Address: Diabetes Management Centre
490 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Phone: 705-734-9690
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ZATELNY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zatelny (CPSO#: 51881 )
Business Address: 121 Wellington St W
201
Barrie ON L4N 1L2
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Address: 490 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON L4N 6M2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE LYNN ZATELNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZATELNY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANE LYNN ZATELNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZATELNY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1988

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982