THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 20:03:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2221 Keele Street
Suite 306
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 240-0027
Fax: (416) 240-8978

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George P. L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wong (CPSO#: 106184 ) Dr. L. Wong (CPSO#: 95727 ) Dr. G. Wong (CPSO#: 51891 )
Business Address: 306 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
(416) 240-0027

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2221 Keele Street
Suite 306
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 240-0027
Fax: (416) 240-8978

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 03 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George P. L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wong (CPSO#: 106184 ) Dr. L. Wong (CPSO#: 95727 ) Dr. G. Wong (CPSO#: 51891 )
Business Address: 306 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
(416) 240-0027

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE PUI LUONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE PUI LUONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981