THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:13:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whitby Cardiovascular
3020 Brock Street North
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-0416
Fax: (905) 668-8778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Naresh Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kumar (CPSO#: 51905 )
Business Address: 3020 Brock Street North
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J7
(905) 668-0416

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Whitby Cardiovascular
3020 Brock Street North
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-0416
Fax: (905) 668-8778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Naresh Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kumar (CPSO#: 51905 )
Business Address: 3020 Brock Street North
Whitby Ontario L1R 3J7
(905) 668-0416

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calcutta, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981