THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:52:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2426 - 555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-8870
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ER, St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W2
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret A. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thompson (CPSO#: 51945 )
Business Address: C1-30 Bond Street
Emergency Room
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5094
Business Address: Ontario Poison Centre
2426 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-8870

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2426 - 555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-8870
Fax: No Information Available
Address: ER, St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W2
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret A. Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Thompson (CPSO#: 51945 )
Business Address: C1-30 Bond Street
Emergency Room
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5094
Business Address: Ontario Poison Centre
2426 - 555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-8870

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNE THOMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982