THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1973
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, ILOCANO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 318 Ontario Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-6650
Fax: (905) 688-4551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. B. Zapata Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zapata (CPSO#: 51994 )
Business Address: 318 Ontario Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 5L8
(905) 688-6650

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, ILOCANO
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 318 Ontario Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2R 5L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 688-6650
Fax: (905) 688-4551

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. B. Zapata Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zapata (CPSO#: 51994 )
Business Address: 318 Ontario Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 5L8
(905) 688-6650

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYRNA BALMACEDA ZAPATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAPATA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYRNA BALMACEDA ZAPATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAPATA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 1982