THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:29:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3 Chipstead Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 816-9810
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stanley S. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tam (CPSO#: 52009 )
Business Address: 3 Chipstead Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3E5
(416) 391-2210

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3 Chipstead Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 816-9810
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 20 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stanley S. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tam (CPSO#: 52009 )
Business Address: 3 Chipstead Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 3E5
(416) 391-2210

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STANLEY SUN-KUN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STANLEY SUN-KUN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982