THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:06:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-1171
Fax: (416) 461-1172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Vavougios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vavougios (CPSO#: 52020 )
Business Address: 202 - 245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 461-1171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-1171
Fax: (416) 461-1172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Vavougios Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vavougios (CPSO#: 52020 )
Business Address: 202 - 245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 461-1171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIMMY VAVOUGIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAVOUGIOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JIMMY VAVOUGIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAVOUGIOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982