THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:41:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trilliumhealthpartners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7524
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 12 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darby Kelly Vickar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vickar (CPSO#: 52094 )
Business Address: Trillium Helath Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7524

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trilliumhealthpartners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7524
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 12 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darby Kelly Vickar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vickar (CPSO#: 52094 )
Business Address: Trillium Helath Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7524

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARBY KELLY VICKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARBY KELLY VICKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VICKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982