THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:19:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Monash University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-925-7749
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 72 Orchard Blvd
Stevenson, Waplak & Associates
Belleville Ontario K8P 2K7
Phone: (613) 9670545
Extension: 210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2180 County Road 3
Carrying place
Belleville Ontario K0K 1L3
Phone: (416) 925-7749
Fax: (613) 968-7503
Address: 39-2350 New St
Burlington ON L7R 4P8
Phone: 1-905-634-4711
Fax: 1-905-634-4711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark A. Voysey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Voysey (CPSO#: 52099 )
Business Address: 250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2E2
(416) 925-7749
Business Address: 72 Orchard Boulevard
Belleville Ontario K8P 2K7
(613) 967-0545
Business Address: 2180 County Road 3
Carrying Place Ontario K0K 1L3
(416) 931-4607
Business Address: 39-2350 New St
Burlington ON L7R 4P8
9056344711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Monash University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-925-7749
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 72 Orchard Blvd
Stevenson, Waplak & Associates
Belleville Ontario K8P 2K7
Phone: (613) 9670545
Extension: 210
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2180 County Road 3
Carrying place
Belleville Ontario K0K 1L3
Phone: (416) 925-7749
Fax: (613) 968-7503
Address: 39-2350 New St
Burlington ON L7R 4P8
Phone: 1-905-634-4711
Fax: 1-905-634-4711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark A. Voysey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Voysey (CPSO#: 52099 )
Business Address: 250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2E2
(416) 925-7749
Business Address: 72 Orchard Boulevard
Belleville Ontario K8P 2K7
(613) 967-0545
Business Address: 2180 County Road 3
Carrying Place Ontario K0K 1L3
(416) 931-4607
Business Address: 39-2350 New St
Burlington ON L7R 4P8
9056344711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALLEN VOYSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOYSEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALLEN VOYSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOYSEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Monash University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982