THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:56:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Rhodesia, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6633 Highway 7 East
Suite 315
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-3700
Fax: (905) 471-3702

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norman N. Musewe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Musewe (CPSO#: 52106 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Rhodesia, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6633 Highway 7 East
Suite 315
Markham Ontario L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 471-3700
Fax: (905) 471-3702

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norman N. Musewe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Musewe (CPSO#: 52106 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORMAN NHAMU MUSEWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSEWE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORMAN NHAMU MUSEWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSEWE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Rhodesia, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 1982