THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:12:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 411
2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 740-3949
Fax: (416) 740-6734

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura L. Whiteacre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Whiteacre (CPSO#: 52113 )
Business Address: 2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 411
North York Ontario M3N 2V6
(416) 740-3949

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 411
2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 740-3949
Fax: (416) 740-6734

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura L. Whiteacre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Whiteacre (CPSO#: 52113 )
Business Address: 2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 411
North York Ontario M3N 2V6
(416) 740-3949

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA LOUISE WHITEACRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEACRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA LOUISE WHITEACRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEACRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981