THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:16:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 211
857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-4700
Fax: (519) 354-2616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 22 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert McMahon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. McMahon (CPSO#: 52201 )
Business Address: 211 - 857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
(519) 354-4700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 211
857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 354-4700
Fax: (519) 354-2616

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 22 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg
HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Services Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Sydenham District Hospital
LOCATION: Wallaceburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert McMahon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. McMahon (CPSO#: 52201 )
Business Address: 211 - 857 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 4T1
(519) 354-4700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE MCMAHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMAHON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE MCMAHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMAHON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979