THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:49:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Burr 2
General Surgery
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 -549-6666
Extension: 4743
Fax: 1-855-251-6059

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 15 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Walker (CPSO#: 52235 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Burr 2
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 4743

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Burr 2
General Surgery
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 -549-6666
Extension: 4743
Fax: 1-855-251-6059

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 15 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ross Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Walker (CPSO#: 52235 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Burr 2
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666 Extn: 4743

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE ROSS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE ROSS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982