THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 02 Dec 2021
Summary:
On December 2, 2021, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital suspended Dr. David Sion’s hospital privileges effective October 7, 2021 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
 
On May 3, 2022, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital revoked/terminated Dr. Rosen’s hospital privileges effective as of April 21, 2022 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
 

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sion (CPSO#: 52260 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Effective Date: 02 Dec 2021
Summary:
On December 2, 2021, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital suspended Dr. David Sion’s hospital privileges effective October 7, 2021 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
 
On May 3, 2022, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College, pursuant to section 33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Windsor Regional Hospital revoked/terminated Dr. Rosen’s hospital privileges effective as of April 21, 2022 due to failure to comply with hospital policy.
 

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sion (CPSO#: 52260 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SION is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SION is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 1983