THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:47:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Suites 11 &12
965 Bovaird Drive West, Brampton
Ontario L6X 5K7
Brampton Ontario L6X 5K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497 7779
Fax: 905 497 7707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Umesh Rayar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Rayar (CPSO#: 52328 )
Business Address: 208 - 178 John Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A4
(905) 450-0414
Business Address: 11-965 Bovaird Dr W
Brampton ON L6X 5K7
9054977779

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bovaird Pediatric Clinic
Suites 11 &12
965 Bovaird Drive West, Brampton
Ontario L6X 5K7
Brampton Ontario L6X 5K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497 7779
Fax: 905 497 7707

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Umesh Rayar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Rayar (CPSO#: 52328 )
Business Address: 208 - 178 John Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A4
(905) 450-0414
Business Address: 11-965 Bovaird Dr W
Brampton ON L6X 5K7
9054977779

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMESH RAYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMESH RAYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 1983