THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:36:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-998-0470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 801-699 Aberdeen Blvd
Midland ON L4R 5P2
Phone: 6479980470
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Quigley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Quigley (CPSO#: 52333 )
Business Address: Radiology Now Inc.
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
(416) 964-7265

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 301
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-998-0470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 801-699 Aberdeen Blvd
Midland ON L4R 5P2
Phone: 6479980470
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Quigley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Quigley (CPSO#: 52333 )
Business Address: Radiology Now Inc.
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M2N 5W9
(416) 964-7265

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
18 Aug 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 18 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from August 18, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.Mark John Quigley, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Quigley to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. MARK JOHN QUIGLEY
("Dr. Quigley")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.

(2) I, Dr. Quigley, certificate of registration number 52333, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

(3) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
bearing File Number 7214916 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my diagnostic
radiology practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Quigley, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
from the date on which I sign it.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Quigley, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease
to engage in any of the following areas of practice:

(i) The interpretation of CT images.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Quigley, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I
further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
location.

(b) I, Dr. Quigley, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Quigley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

(7) I, Dr. Quigley, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
my right to do so.

(11) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
remains in effect.

(12) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Quigley was the subject of a College investigation into whether
he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation,
Dr. Quigley has agreed not to practise any of the following: the
interpretation of CT images.

D. CONSENT

(13) I, Dr. Quigley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from August 18, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.Mark John Quigley, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Quigley to the College
of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. MARK JOHN QUIGLEY
("Dr. Quigley")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.

(2) I, Dr. Quigley, certificate of registration number 52333, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

(3) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
bearing File Number 7214916 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my diagnostic
radiology practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Quigley, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
from the date on which I sign it.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Quigley, undertake that, effective immediately, I will cease
to engage in any of the following areas of practice:

(i) The interpretation of CT images.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Quigley, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I
further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
location.

(b) I, Dr. Quigley, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Quigley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

(7) I, Dr. Quigley, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
my right to do so.

(11) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
remains in effect.

(12) I, Dr. Quigley, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Quigley was the subject of a College investigation into whether
he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation,
Dr. Quigley has agreed not to practise any of the following: the
interpretation of CT images.

D. CONSENT

(13) I, Dr. Quigley, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 18 Aug 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mark John Quigley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 18, 2016:

Dr. Quigley was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Quigley has agreed not to practise any of the following: the interpretation of CT images.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 18 Aug 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mark John Quigley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 18, 2016:

Dr. Quigley was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Quigley has agreed not to practise any of the following: the interpretation of CT images.

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 03 Aug 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 1983