THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:40:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 285 Cummer Ave
st John's Rehab
North York ON M2M 2G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-225-0040
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
North York Ontario M6A 2E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. John's Rehabilitation Hospital
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
Phone: (416) 226-6780
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Perry Joel Rush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rush (CPSO#: 52364 )
Business Address: 285 Cummer Ave
St. John's Rehab
North York ON M2M 2G1
416-225-0040

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 285 Cummer Ave
st John's Rehab
North York ON M2M 2G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-225-0040
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
North York Ontario M6A 2E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. John's Rehabilitation Hospital
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 2G1
Phone: (416) 226-6780
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Rheumatology
Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 02 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St John's Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Perry Joel Rush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Rush (CPSO#: 52364 )
Business Address: 285 Cummer Ave
St. John's Rehab
North York ON M2M 2G1
416-225-0040

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PERRY JOEL RUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PERRY JOEL RUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUSH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 1983