THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:26:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Osmania University, 1961
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brandongate Medical Clinic
Unit 6
4025 Brandongate Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4T 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 678-2831
Fax: (905) 678-1515
Address: 7070 Saint Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5W 0E6
Phone: 905-565-9100
Fax: 905-565-8973

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.BH Danial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Danial (CPSO#: 52374 )
Business Address: 6 - 4025 Brandongate Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4T 3Z9
(905) 678-2831

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Osmania University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brandongate Medical Clinic
Unit 6
4025 Brandongate Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4T 3Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 678-2831
Fax: (905) 678-1515
Address: 7070 Saint Barbara Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5W 0E6
Phone: 905-565-9100
Fax: 905-565-8973

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.BH Danial Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Danial (CPSO#: 52374 )
Business Address: 6 - 4025 Brandongate Drive
Mississauga Ontario L4T 3Z9
(905) 678-2831

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHAUDDIN HASAN DANIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHAUDDIN HASAN DANIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Osmania University, 1961

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1983
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 1983