THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:12:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 4N 494
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5174
Fax: (416) 340-4210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorretta Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Daniel (CPSO#: 52376 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 4N-494
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-5174

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 4N 494
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-5174
Fax: (416) 340-4210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 28 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorretta Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Daniel (CPSO#: 52376 )
Business Address: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 4N-494
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-5174

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORRETTA BERNICE DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LORRETTA BERNICE DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983