THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:43:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 759-1914
Fax: (519) 759-3605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Schnider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schnider (CPSO#: 52391 )
Business Address: 217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 208
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 759-1914

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 759-1914
Fax: (519) 759-3605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 21 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denise Schnider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Schnider (CPSO#: 52391 )
Business Address: 217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 208
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 759-1914

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISE LYNN SCHNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNIDER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISE LYNN SCHNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNIDER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 May 2018
Summary:
Effective December 17, 2019, Dr. Denise Schnider, has met all requirements of her ICRC SCERP decision dated May 11, 2018.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 May 2018
Summary:
Effective December 17, 2019, Dr. Denise Schnider, has met all requirements of her ICRC SCERP decision dated May 11, 2018.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983