THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:42:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Smith (CPSO#: 52393 ) Dr. J. Freedman (CPSO#: 58403 )
Business Address: 146 Wyndham Street North
Guelph Ontario N1M 4E8
(519) 822-6100
Business Address: 509 Park Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1N9
(519) 746-1919
Business Address: 404 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-9898

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 404
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 09 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Smith (CPSO#: 52393 ) Dr. J. Freedman (CPSO#: 58403 )
Business Address: 146 Wyndham Street North
Guelph Ontario N1M 4E8
(519) 822-6100
Business Address: 509 Park Street
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1N9
(519) 746-1919
Business Address: 404 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-9898

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EILEEN MARGUERITE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EILEEN MARGUERITE SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983