THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:56:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sullivan Cardiology
70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8R 1L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-8926
Fax: (905) 529-2280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh P Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sullivan (CPSO#: 52421 )
Business Address: 70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8R 1C2

Corporation Name: Hugh P. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sullivan Cardiology
70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8R 1L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-8926
Fax: (905) 529-2280

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh P Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sullivan (CPSO#: 52421 )
Business Address: 70 Ferguson Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8R 1C2

Corporation Name: Hugh P. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUGH PATRICK SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HUGH PATRICK SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983