THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:52:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2372 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-1600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Mackinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mackinnon (CPSO#: 52422 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2372 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga Ontario L5L 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-1600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Mackinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mackinnon (CPSO#: 52422 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES ALASTAIR MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES ALASTAIR MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983