THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:35:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 203
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-5670
Fax: (519) 578-4820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Wilson (CPSO#: 52429 )
Business Address: 564 Blemont Avenue West
Suite 203
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 578-5679

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 564 Belmont Avenue West
Suite 203
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-5670
Fax: (519) 578-4820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 10 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Wilson (CPSO#: 52429 )
Business Address: 564 Blemont Avenue West
Suite 203
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N6
(519) 578-5679

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN MALCOLM WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN MALCOLM WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983