THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:45:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen J. Cluff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cluff (CPSO#: 52451 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Suite 102
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 792-0933

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Trench St
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058831212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen J. Cluff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cluff (CPSO#: 52451 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: Suite 102
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 792-0933

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN CLUFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLUFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN CLUFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLUFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983