THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:49:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c/o Renal Unit
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 658-2241
Fax: (416) 658-2242
Address: 1054 wilson ave
Toronto Ontario M3K1G6
Phone: 4167463012
Fax: 4167467016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Berall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Berall (CPSO#: 52452 )
Business Address: 1045 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1G6
(416) 746-3012
Business Address: 9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
(416) 588-3788
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
Renal Unit
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5M 0B2
(416) 242-1099

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: c/o Renal Unit
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 658-2241
Fax: (416) 658-2242
Address: 1054 wilson ave
Toronto Ontario M3K1G6
Phone: 4167463012
Fax: 4167467016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Berall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Berall (CPSO#: 52452 )
Business Address: 1045 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 1G6
(416) 746-3012
Business Address: 9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3Z8
(416) 588-3788
Business Address: Humber River Hospital
Renal Unit
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5M 0B2
(416) 242-1099

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MURRAY JAY BERALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MURRAY JAY BERALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983