THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:48:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2065 Finch Ave W
Suite 400
Downsview, Ontario M3N2V7
Downsview Ontario M3N 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Fax: (416) 748-8582

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 26 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theodore Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rabinovitch (CPSO#: 52453 )

Corporation Name: Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2065 Finch Ave W
Suite 400
Downsview, Ontario M3N2V7
Downsview Ontario M3N 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Fax: (416) 748-8582

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 26 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Theodore Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rabinovitch (CPSO#: 52453 )

Corporation Name: Rabinovitch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Feb 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THEODORE RABINOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVITCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THEODORE RABINOVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RABINOVITCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 1988

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983