THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-410 Giles Blvd E
Windsor ON N9A 4C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-946-1256
Fax: 519-736-1581

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Bartol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bartol (CPSO#: 52465 )
Business Address: 410 Giles Boulevard East
Windsor Ontario N9A 4C6
Business Address: Suite 178
2224 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8L 5L7
(519) 946-1256

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-410 Giles Blvd E
Windsor ON N9A 4C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-946-1256
Fax: 519-736-1581

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Bartol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bartol (CPSO#: 52465 )
Business Address: 410 Giles Boulevard East
Windsor Ontario N9A 4C6
Business Address: Suite 178
2224 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8L 5L7
(519) 946-1256

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN WILLIAM BARTOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN WILLIAM BARTOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Aug 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1987

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983