THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:31:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Haiti, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CREOLE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 336 Donald St
Ottawa Ontario K1K 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 563-2121
Fax: (613)563-1331

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serge Jabouin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jabouin (CPSO#: 52471 )
Business Address: 336 Donald Street
Ottawa Ontario K1K 1M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CREOLE
Medical School: University of Haiti, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 336 Donald St
Ottawa Ontario K1K 1M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 563-2121
Fax: (613)563-1331

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Serge Jabouin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jabouin (CPSO#: 52471 )
Business Address: 336 Donald Street
Ottawa Ontario K1K 1M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERGE JABOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABOUIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SERGE JABOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABOUIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Aug 1994
Summary of Decision:
In August 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Jabouin guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Jabouin be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months. This suspension was itself to be suspended, however, provided that the Doctor agreed to undertake a gender sensitivity counselling program. The Committee also ordered that periodic reports be made to the Registrar, on a frequency to be agreed upon between the Registrar and the treating physician.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1996-06-05
Hearing Date(s): Aug 22, 1994

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Aug 1994
Summary of Decision:
In August 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Jabouin guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(33) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Jabouin be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months. This suspension was itself to be suspended, however, provided that the Doctor agreed to undertake a gender sensitivity counselling program. The Committee also ordered that periodic reports be made to the Registrar, on a frequency to be agreed upon between the Registrar and the treating physician.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1996-06-05
Hearing Date(s): Aug 22, 1994

Training

Medical School: University of Haiti, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 1985

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983