THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:24:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can contact RSRS: Telephone 1-888-563-3732, Fax 416-398-5932.
Date Received: 16 Jul 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael E. Aubrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aubrey (CPSO#: 52472 )
Business Address: Dixon Medical Centre
307 - 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
(905) 853-1843

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Dec 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Requests for medical records can contact RSRS: Telephone 1-888-563-3732, Fax 416-398-5932.
Date Received: 16 Jul 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Oak Valley Health Markham
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael E. Aubrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aubrey (CPSO#: 52472 )
Business Address: Dixon Medical Centre
307 - 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 6P5
(905) 853-1843

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ERIC AUBREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUBREY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ERIC AUBREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUBREY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 1986

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981