THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:32:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Landon Street
Bonfield Ontario P0H 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057763655
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Feige Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Feige (CPSO#: 52522 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 476-2104
Business Address: 60 Champlain Street
Suite 104
North Bay Ontario P1B 7M4
(705) 476-2104

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105 Landon Street
Bonfield Ontario P0H 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057763655
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Feige Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Feige (CPSO#: 52522 )
Business Address: 50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
(705) 476-2104
Business Address: 60 Champlain Street
Suite 104
North Bay Ontario P1B 7M4
(705) 476-2104

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERWIN FEIGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEIGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERWIN FEIGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEIGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983