THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 350-0550
Fax: (647) 350-0552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ing-Jeu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ing (CPSO#: 32215 ) Dr. J. Jeu (CPSO#: 52525 )
Business Address: 310 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
(647) 350-0550
Business Address: 551 Conlins Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 5S1
(416) 282-6768
Business Address: 3830 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1R6
(416) 439-1243
Business Address: 2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T8
(416) 397-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 350-0550
Fax: (647) 350-0552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ing-Jeu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ing (CPSO#: 32215 ) Dr. J. Jeu (CPSO#: 52525 )
Business Address: 310 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
(647) 350-0550
Business Address: 551 Conlins Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 5S1
(416) 282-6768
Business Address: 3830 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1R6
(416) 439-1243
Business Address: 2920 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T8
(416) 397-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOAN PAULINE JEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOAN PAULINE JEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983