THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:00:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 149 King St W
Durham Retina Specialists
Oshawa ON L1J 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 434-2669
Fax: 905 434-3807

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 16 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalia Baziuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Baziuk (CPSO#: 52526 )
Business Address: 149 King St W
Durham Retina Specialists
Oshawa ON L1J 2J3
905 434-2669
Business Address: 149 King St W
Durham Retina Specialists
Oshawa ON L1J 2J3
905 434-2669
Business Address: 1 - 491 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4J9
(905) 434-2669

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 149 King St W
Durham Retina Specialists
Oshawa ON L1J 2J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 434-2669
Fax: 905 434-3807

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 16 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natalia Baziuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Baziuk (CPSO#: 52526 )
Business Address: 149 King St W
Durham Retina Specialists
Oshawa ON L1J 2J3
905 434-2669
Business Address: 149 King St W
Durham Retina Specialists
Oshawa ON L1J 2J3
905 434-2669
Business Address: 1 - 491 Simcoe Street South
Oshawa Ontario L1H 4J9
(905) 434-2669

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIA BAZIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZIUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATALIA BAZIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZIUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983