THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:35:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pine Seven Medical Centre
Suite 180
4600 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-3330
Fax: (905) 856-3331

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allen Weinberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weinberger (CPSO#: 52529 )
Business Address: Pine Seven Medical Centre
Suite 180
4600 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-3330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pine Seven Medical Centre
Suite 180
4600 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-3330
Fax: (905) 856-3331

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allen Weinberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weinberger (CPSO#: 52529 )
Business Address: Pine Seven Medical Centre
Suite 180
4600 Highway 7 West
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-3330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN NATHAN WEINBERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN NATHAN WEINBERGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEINBERGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983