THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 509
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 799-9875
Fax: (289) 298-5339
Address: 400 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4G4
Phone: (905) 456-3334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Li (CPSO#: 52535 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 509
18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 799-9875
Fax: (289) 298-5339
Address: 400 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 4G4
Phone: (905) 456-3334
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Li (CPSO#: 52535 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAO-JIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAO-JIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983