THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:44:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Rm B310, PO Box 249C
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick J. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sullivan (CPSO#: 52614 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite 249C
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4169
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 82248
Business Address: 750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orléans Ontario K4A 0Z9
(613) 778-8888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Rm B310, PO Box 249C
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patrick J. Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sullivan (CPSO#: 52614 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite 249C
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4169
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 82248
Business Address: 750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orléans Ontario K4A 0Z9
(613) 778-8888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983