THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Create Fertility Centre
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clifford Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Librach (CPSO#: 52630 )
Business Address: 4166483464
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Librach (CPSO#: 52630 )
Business Address: 117 King St E
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
(905) 721-3582

Corporation Name: Dr. Clifford Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Librach (CPSO#: 52630 )
Business Address: Create Fertility Centre
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 323-7727

Corporation Name: Clifford L. Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Create Fertility Centre
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 323-7727
Fax: (416) 323-7334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clifford Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Librach (CPSO#: 52630 )
Business Address: 4166483464
Business Address:

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Librach (CPSO#: 52630 )
Business Address: 117 King St E
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
(905) 721-3582

Corporation Name: Dr. Clifford Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Librach (CPSO#: 52630 )
Business Address: Create Fertility Centre
Suite 1100
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 323-7727

Corporation Name: Clifford L. Librach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLIFFORD LAWRENCE LIBRACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBRACH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLIFFORD LAWRENCE LIBRACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBRACH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983