THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:29:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 552 Princess St
Addiction and Mental Health Services
Kingston ON K7L 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134836116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Hillen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hillen (CPSO#: 52649 )
Business Address: 552 Princess St
Kingston ON K7L 1C7
6135441356

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 552 Princess St
Addiction and Mental Health Services
Kingston ON K7L 1C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134836116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Hillen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hillen (CPSO#: 52649 )
Business Address: 552 Princess St
Kingston ON K7L 1C7
6135441356

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES MCLAREN HILLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILLEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES MCLAREN HILLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HILLEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1983